Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro-Antonio Luciani

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Segni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1773³BornValmontone
25 Aug 179622.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
11 Sep 179622.9Ordained PriestPriest
24 May 182450.6AppointedBishop of Segni, Italy
30 May 182450.6Ordained BishopBishop of Segni, Italy
9 Jun 184167.6ResignedBishop of Segni, Italy
8 Dec 184471.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Segni, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro-Antonio Luciani:
Bishop Pietro-Antonio Luciani (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Segni

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 346

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013