Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Russo

Deceased

Bishop of Ariano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1752³BornNapoli
21 Dec 177624.1Ordained PriestPriest
20 Mar 181865.4SelectedBishop of Ariano, Italy
6 Apr 181865.4ConfirmedBishop of Ariano, Italy
12 Apr 181865.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ariano, Italy
6 Feb 183784.3DiedBishop of Ariano, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Russo:
Bishop Domenico Russo (born , died ) Bishop of Ariano

  • a priest for 60.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 89

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013