Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Maria Botticelli, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lacedonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1761BornSora
24 Jul 178524.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
19 Nov 181958.3SelectedBishop of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo, Italy
21 Feb 182058.5ConfirmedBishop of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo, Italy
25 Feb 182058.5Ordained BishopBishop of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo, Italy
10 Jan 182260.4SelectedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
19 Apr 182260.7ConfirmedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
21 Apr 182866.7SelectedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
23 Jun 182866.9ConfirmedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
25 Oct 183271.2DiedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Botticelli
Bishop Giuseppe Maria Botticelli O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Lacedonia

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1822
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 201, and Page 231
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 254
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1820, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 May 2016