Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Taddeo Garzilli (Garzillo)

Deceased

Bishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

Bishop of Acerra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1774BornSolofra
21 Sep 179925.7Ordained PriestPriest
4 May 182854.3SelectedBishop of Boiano, Italy
23 Jun 182854.5ConfirmedBishop of Boiano, Italy
6 Jul 182854.5Ordained BishopBishop of Boiano, Italy
7 Jan 183460.0SelectedBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
7 Jan 183460.0SelectedBishop of Acerra, Italy
20 Jan 183460.0ConfirmedBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
20 Jan 183460.0ConfirmedBishop of Acerra, Italy
5 Mar 184874.2DiedBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Taddeo Garzilli (Garzillo):
Bishop Taddeo Garzilli (Garzillo) (born , died ) Bishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1834
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 61, and Page 114

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013