Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Conversini

Deceased

Bishop of Cortona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1789BornPistoia
23 Sep 181526.6Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jul 182435.4AppointedBishop of Cortona, Italy
18 Jul 182435.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cortona, Italy
21 Jun 182637.3DiedBishop of Cortona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Conversini (VIAF: 88703719)
Bishop Girolamo Conversini (born , died ) Bishop of Cortona

  • a priest for 10.7 years
  • a bishop for 1.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 165
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1824, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 6 Jun 2016