Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe-Maria Lais

Deceased

Bishop of Ferentino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1775BornRoma
7 Apr 179823.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Mar 181843.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus
19 Apr 181843.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus
10 Mar 182348.0AppointedBishop of Ferentino, Italy
18 Jan 1836³60.8DiedBishop of Ferentino, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe-Maria Lais:
Bishop Giuseppe-Maria Lais (born , died ) Bishop of Ferentino

  • a priest for 37.8 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1833
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 192, and Page 216

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013