Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Battista Parretti

Deceased

Archbishop of Pisa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1779Born
5 Mar 180323.2Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jan 182848.1AppointedBishop of Fiesole, Italy
3 Feb 182848.1Ordained BishopBishop of Fiesole, Italy
23 Dec 183960.0AppointedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy
19 Nov 185171.9DiedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Parretti (VIAF: 57434640)
Archbishop Giovanni Battista Parretti (born , died ) Archbishop of Pisa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastello di Segna

  • a priest for 48.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1851
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 194, and Page 307
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1828, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast