Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mariano Bianco

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Amalfi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1775BornNapoli
16 Feb 179923.4Ordained PriestPriest
31 Jan 182751.3SelectedBishop of Nicotera e Tropea, Italy
9 Apr 182751.5ConfirmedBishop of Nicotera e Tropea, Italy
16 Apr 182751.5Ordained BishopBishop of Nicotera e Tropea, Italy
1 Mar 183155.4SelectedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
30 Sep 183156.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
22 Nov 184873.1RetiredArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
18 Sep 185175.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Amalfi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mariano Bianco (VIAF: 88780409)
Archbishop Mariano Bianco (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Amalfi

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1842
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 69, and Page 284
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1827, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Jun 2016