Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe-Maria Molajoni, C.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nicopoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1780BornRoma
1804¹23.7ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Passion
23 Sep 182545.4AppointedBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
25 Sep 182545.5Ordained BishopBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
12 Jul 184767.2ResignedBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
16 Jul 185979.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Nicopoli, Bulgaria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe-Maria Molajoni
Bishop Giuseppe-Maria Molajoni C.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nicopoli

  • a bishop for 33.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 283
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1825, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 11 Jun 2016