Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Bolognese

Deceased

Bishop of Andria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1747BornChieti
21 Sep 177124.2Ordained PriestPriest
8 Oct 181871.2SelectedBishop of Termoli, Italy
29 Mar 181971.7ConfirmedBishop of Termoli, Italy
12 Apr 181971.7Ordained BishopBishop of Termoli, Italy
10 Jan 182274.5SelectedBishop of Andria, Italy
19 Apr 182274.7ConfirmedBishop of Andria, Italy
13 Sep 183083.1DiedBishop of Andria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Bolognese
Bishop Giovanni Battista Bolognese (born , died ) Bishop of Andria

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 74, and Page 366
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1819, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 14 May 2016