Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Salvatore de Luca

Deceased

Archbishop of Rossano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1769BornNapoli
22 Sep 179223.5Ordained PriestPriest
31 Jan 182757.9SelectedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
9 Apr 182758.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
16 Apr 182758.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
28 Apr 183364.1DiedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvatore de Luca:
Archbishop Salvatore de Luca (born , died ) Archbishop of Rossano

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 6.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1834
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 325

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013