Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bonaventura Zabberoni, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Moldavia

Titular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1764¹Born
19 Jul 182561.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Moldavia
19 Jul 182561.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia
4 Sep 182561.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia
30 Jul 182662.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Moldavia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bonaventura Zabberoni
Bishop Bonaventura Zabberoni O.F.M. Conv. (born 1764, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Moldavia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceItaly

  • a bishop for .9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 211
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1825, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 7 Aug 2018

Quantcast