Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Ambrosi

Deceased

Bishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1755³Born
11 Mar 178024.8Ordained PriestPriest
17 Nov 182368.4AppointedBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy
23 Nov 182368.5Ordained BishopBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy
29 May 182570.0DiedBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Filippo Ambrosi
Bishop Filippo Ambrosi (born , died ) Bishop of Montalto (delle Marche)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAscoli Piceno, Diocese of Ascoli Piceno

  • a priest for 45.2 years
  • a bishop for 1.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,824
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 270
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,823, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast