Catholic-Hierarchy DC

(Layman) Abraham Chasciùr

Deceased

Note/Previous Titular See: Memphis/Coptic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1802Born
25 Jul 182422.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
26 Jul 182422.3Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jul 182422.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Memphis
1 Aug 182422.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Memphis
3 Feb 182623.8RemovedTitular Archbishop of Memphis
3 Feb 182623.8Laicized
1877²74.7Died

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Abraham Chasciùr (VIAF: 251133370)
(Layman) Abraham Chasciùr (born , died 1877)

EventPlace
Death PlaceSpoleto

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 52.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 262
  • b/c0+: CB, 8 Mar 2016
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Number 18,834
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1824, Number 55
  • d: CB, 19 Aug 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast