Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Maria Manieri, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ruvo e Bitonto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1751BornNeritonen
11 Feb 177624.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
1 May 177624.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
28 Nov 181867.1SelectedBishop of Ruvo e Bitonto, Italy
29 Mar 181967.4ConfirmedBishop of Ruvo e Bitonto, Italy
12 Apr 181967.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ruvo e Bitonto, Italy
1833¹81.2DiedBishop of Ruvo e Bitonto, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Maria Manieri:
Bishop Vincenzo Maria Manieri O.F.M. Conv. (born ) Bishop of Ruvo e Bitonto

  • a priest for 56.7 years
  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 326

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013