Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Baldassare Leone

Deceased

Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1756BornPalermo
19 Dec 177822.8Ordained PriestPriest
7 Sep 181862.5SelectedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
2 Oct 181862.6ConfirmedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
4 Oct 181862.6Ordained BishopBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
22 Jul 182064.4DiedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy

MicroData Summary for Baldassare Leone
Bishop Baldassare Leone (born , died ) Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti)

  • a priest for 41.5 years
  • a bishop for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 63
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1818, Number 77

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 11 May 2016