Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Monti

Deceased

Bishop of Cagli e Pergola, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1764Born
23 Dec 178622.9Ordained PriestPriest
14 Apr 181753.2AppointedBishop of Sarsina, Italy
27 Apr 181753.3Ordained BishopBishop of Sarsina, Italy
25 May 181854.3AppointedBishop of Cagli, Italy
18 Jan 181955.0AppointedBishop of Cagli e Pergola, Italy
7 Jan 184278.0DiedBishop of Cagli e Pergola, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Monti
Bishop Carlo Monti (born , died ) Bishop of Cagli e Pergola

EventPlace
Birth PlaceImola, Diocese of Imola

  • a priest for 55.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1817, Number 11
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 127, and Page 335

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast