Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luigi Cardinal Amat di San Filippo e Sorso

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso

Archpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1796Born
24 Dec 182630.5Ordained PriestPriest
9 Apr 182730.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
22 Apr 182730.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
24 Apr 182730.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Sicily, Italy
13 Nov 183236.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
31 Jul 183539.1ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
19 May 183740.9Elevated to Cardinal
2 Oct 183741.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via
15 Mar 185255.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
27 Sep 185256.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso
21 Sep 186771.2AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
8 Oct 187074.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
12 Mar 187780.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
30 Mar 187881.7DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

MicroData Summary for Luigi Amat di San Filippo e Sorso (VIAF: 39468679)
Luigi Cardinal Amat di San Filippo e Sorso (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSinnai, Archdiocese of Cagliari, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 50.9 years
  • a cardinal for 40.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 44, and Page 48
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 282
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1827, Number 10
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 May 1837
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 176, and Page 236

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 16 Jun 2018

Quantcast