Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Maria Parisio (Canisio)

Deceased

Archbishop of Gaeta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1783³BornNapoli
24 Sep 180824.8Ordained PriestPriest
31 Jan 182743.1SelectedBishop of Venosa, Italy
9 Apr 182743.3ConfirmedBishop of Venosa, Italy
16 Apr 182743.3Ordained BishopBishop of Venosa, Italy
26 May 182743.4SelectedBishop of Gaeta, Italy
25 Jun 182743.5ConfirmedBishop of Gaeta, Italy
31 Dec 184865.0AppointedArchbishop of Gaeta, Italy
26 Jan 185470.1DiedArchbishop of Gaeta, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Maria Parisio (Canisio):
Archbishop Luigi Maria Parisio (Canisio) (born , died ) Archbishop of Gaeta

  • a priest for 45.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 125, and Page 392

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013