Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raphael Lupoli, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Larino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1767Born
25 Dec 178215.1ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
22 Aug 179022.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
13 May 181850.5SelectedBishop of Larino, Italy
25 May 181850.5ConfirmedBishop of Larino, Italy
26 May 181850.5Ordained BishopBishop of Larino, Italy
12 Dec 182760.1DiedBishop of Larino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Raphael Lupoli
Bishop Raphael Lupoli C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Larino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFrattamaggiore

  • a priest for 37.3 years
  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 232
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast