Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Maria Pellicano

Deceased

Bishop of Gerace


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1764BornGivoiosa
24 Mar 178722.9Ordained PriestPriest of Gerace, Italy
8 Oct 181854.5SelectedBishop of Gerace, Italy
21 Dec 181854.7ConfirmedBishop of Gerace, Italy
27 Dec 181854.7Ordained BishopBishop of Gerace, Italy
19 Jun 183369.1DiedBishop of Gerace, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Pellicano
Bishop Giuseppe Maria Pellicano (born , died ) Bishop of Gerace

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 213
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818, Number 88

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 11 May 2016