Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Monacelli

Deceased

Bishop of Pesaro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1762BornFossombrone
23 Sep 178624.0Ordained PriestPriest
24 May 182461.6AppointedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
30 May 182461.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
15 Dec 182866.2AppointedBishop of Pesaro, Italy
30 Jan 183976.3DiedBishop of Pesaro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Monacelli:
Bishop Filippo Monacelli (born , died ) Bishop of Pesaro

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 308, and Page 324

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013