Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Federico Bencivenni, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bertinoro

Bishop of Sarsina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1759BornSan Giovanni in Persiceto
177616.9ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
22 Dec 178122.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
14 Apr 181758.2AppointedBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
20 Apr 181758.2Ordained BishopBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
1 Sep 182465.6AppointedBishop of Sarsina, Italy
19 Nov 182970.8DiedBishop of Bertinoro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Federico Bencivenni:
Bishop Federico Bencivenni O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Bertinoro

  • a priest for 47.9 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 117

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013