Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Antonio Louis Piatti

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1782BornRoma
30 Nov 180422.5Ordained PriestPriest
13 Aug 182139.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Trapezus
19 Aug 182139.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Trapezus
2 Oct 183755.3AppointedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
19 Feb 184158.7DiedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

MicroData Summary for Antonio Louis Piatti:
Patriarch Antonio Louis Piatti (born , died ) Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a priest for 36.2 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 79, and Page 375

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 10 Jan 2014