Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Corcione

Deceased

Bishop of Bova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1763BornTaverna
16 Feb 178824.4Ordained PriestPriest
22 Mar 182460.5SelectedBishop of Bova, Italy
3 May 182460.6ConfirmedBishop of Bova, Italy
9 May 182460.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bova, Italy
18 Dec 183067.2DiedBishop of Bova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Corcione:
Bishop Giovanni Corcione (born , died ) Bishop of Bova

  • a priest for 42.8 years
  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 116

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013