Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rodolfo Brignole Sale

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Assuras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1784BornGenova, Italy
31 May 180622.2Ordained PriestPriest
25 May 181834.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Assuras
7 Jun 181834.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Assuras
1832¹47.8DiedTitular Bishop of Assuras

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rodolfo Brignole Sale
Bishop Rodolfo Brignole Sale (born , died 1832) Titular Bishop of Assuras

  • a priest for 25.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 92
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 21 May 2016