Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregorio Zelli, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ascoli Piceno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1779BornVetralla
18 Dec 180223.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
24 May 182444.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy
24 May 182444.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus
30 May 182444.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus
21 Mar 182747.3AppointedBishop of Assisi, Italy
2 Jul 183252.6AppointedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
28 Feb 185575.2DiedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Zelli
Bishop Gregorio Zelli O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Ascoli Piceno

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1854
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 91, and Page 216
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1824, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 3 Jun 2016