Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Podestá

Deceased

Bishop of Saluzzo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1772BornAlbaro
28 Feb 179522.7Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 182755.5SelectedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
28 Jan 182855.6ConfirmedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
2 Mar 182855.7Ordained BishopBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
25 May 182856.0InstalledBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
17 Feb 183663.7DiedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Podestá:
Bishop Antonio Podestá (born , died ) Bishop of Saluzzo

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 331

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013