Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Niccola Berlingeri

Deceased

Bishop of Nicastro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1774BornCotrone
19 Sep 179925.0Ordained PriestPriest
9 Sep 182550.9SelectedBishop of Nicastro, Italy
19 Dec 182551.2ConfirmedBishop of Nicastro, Italy
21 Dec 182551.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nicastro, Italy
23 Feb 185479.4DiedBishop of Nicastro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Niccola Berlingeri
Bishop Niccola Berlingeri (born , died ) Bishop of Nicastro

  • a priest for 54.4 years
  • a bishop for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 279
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1825, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 11 Jun 2016