Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignazio Greco

Deceased

Bishop of Oppido Mamertina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1760BornCatanzaro
20 Sep 178322.9Ordained PriestPriest
7 Apr 181958.4SelectedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
4 Jun 181958.6ConfirmedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
6 Jun 181958.6Ordained BishopBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
4 Feb 182261.2DiedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ignazio Greco
Bishop Ignazio Greco (born , died ) Bishop of Oppido Mamertina

  • a priest for 38.3 years
  • a bishop for 2.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 291
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1819, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 14 May 2016