Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe-Maria Amorelli

Deceased

Bishop of Siracusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1781BornSambuca
21 Sep 180524.2Ordained PriestPriest
10 Mar 182341.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia
16 Mar 182341.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia
26 Jul 182443.1SelectedBishop of Siracusa, Italy
20 Dec 182443.5ConfirmedBishop of Siracusa, Italy
13 Dec 184059.4DiedBishop of Siracusa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe-Maria Amorelli:
Bishop Giuseppe-Maria Amorelli (born , died ) Bishop of Siracusa

  • a priest for 35.2 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 211, and Page 355

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013