Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriele Barissich Bosniese, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of LezhŽ {Lesh, Alessio}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1787¹Born
19 Sep 182639.7AppointedBishop of LezhŽ {Lesh, Alessio}, Albania
31 Dec 182640.0Ordained BishopBishop of LezhŽ {Lesh, Alessio}, Albania
3 Jan 184154.0DiedBishop of LezhŽ {Lesh, Alessio}, Albania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gabriele Barissich Bosniese:
Bishop Gabriele Barissich Bosniese O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of LezhŽ {Lesh, Alessio}

  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1834
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013