Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Consiglio

Deceased

Archbishop of Brindisi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1765BornBisceglie
11 Apr 178924.1Ordained PriestPriest
3 Mar 182459.0AppointedBishop of Termoli, Italy
9 May 182459.2Ordained BishopBishop of Termoli, Italy
5 Jul 182560.3SelectedBishop of Brindisi, Italy
13 Mar 182661.0ConfirmedBishop of Brindisi, Italy
23 Nov 183974.7DiedBishop of Brindisi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Consiglio:
Archbishop Pietro Consiglio (born , died ) Archbishop of Brindisi

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1835
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 119, and Page 366

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013