Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Tassinari

Deceased

Bishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1772³Born
21 Mar 179522.7Ordained PriestPriest
27 Sep 182452.3AppointedBishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy
21 Nov 182452.4Ordained BishopBishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy
27 Dec 183260.5DiedBishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Tassinari
Bishop Francesco Tassinari (born , died ) Bishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFaenza

  • a priest for 37.7 years
  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 75
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1824, Number 78

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast