Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Treviso

Dioecesis Tarvisina



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Michele Tomasi, Bishop
  • Gianfranco Agostino Gardin, O.F.M. Conv., Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 4th Century
  • Metropolitan: Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Italy
  • Square Kilometers: 2,194 (847 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Triveneto
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesitv.it/
  • Mailing Address: Curia Vescovile, Piazza Duomo 2, 31100 Treviso, Italia
  • Telephone: 0422.41.67.00
  • Fax: 0422.41.67.15

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
4th CenturyErectedDiocese of Treviso (erected)
969Territory AddedDiocese of Asolo (Cittanova; Eraclea) (suppressed) Diocese of Treviso
6 July 1751Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Treviso (from Aquileia to Udine)
14 September 1929Territory AddedDiocese of Padova {Padua} (Battutilo, Cazzago, and Ballò) Diocese of Treviso
29 January 1954Territory AddedDiocese of Treviso
Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1886306,850.0%4250210OTC
1950541,338541,410100.0%6241788026742341,998238ap1951
1969570,573570,830100.0%5852628476733792,210250ap1971
1980684,417685,66699.8%55327783082414061,420262ap1981
1990720,405727,25699.1%51824776594153931,289265ap1991
1999766,278777,27898.6%4842136971,099123051,036265ap2000
2000769,500783,55698.2%4832106931,110163021,026265ap2001
2001768,500792,43197.0%4792076861,120162981,016265ap2002
2002770,050800,16196.2%4622056671,15417295990265ap2003
2003770,045800,21696.2%4621986601,16617279955265ap2004
2004772,150807,87795.6%4631956581,17317273941265ap2005
2010807,020885,22091.2%4331726051,33322229822265ap2011
2014805,900906,00089.0%4131405531,45722163546265ap2015
2017777,300884,10087.9%3991355341,45526135480265ap2018
2020778,500886,00087.9%3771445211,49426144468265ap2021

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 479, and Page 480
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 248, and Page 249
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 309
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 329
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 370
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 394
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 360
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 537
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 357
  • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 803, to Page 804
  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 22, Page 25
  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 46, Page 224, and Page 225

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 21 Feb 2024