Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Adriano Cevolotto

Bishop-Elect of Piacenza-Bobbio, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1958 Born
26 May 198426.0Ordained PriestPriest of Treviso, Italy
16 Jul 202062.2AppointedBishop of Piacenza-Bobbio, Italy
26 Sep 202062.4Ordained BishopBishop of Piacenza-Bobbio, Italy
11 Oct 202062.4InstalledBishop of Piacenza-Bobbio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Adriano Cevolotto
Father Adriano Cevolotto (born ) Bishop-Elect of Piacenza-Bobbio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTreviso, Diocese of Treviso
Ordained BishopSan Nicolò, Church, Treviso, Diocese of Treviso

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Piacenza-Bobbio.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2020
  • ob/c2+/i: CB, 30 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 1 Aug 2020

Quantcast