Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gino Malvestio, P.I.M.E. †

Deceased

Bishop of Parintins, Amazonas, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1938Born
26 Jun 196527.4Ordained PriestPriest of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
9 Mar 199456.1AppointedBishop of Parintins, Amazonas, Brazil
14 May 199456.3Ordained BishopBishop of Parintins, Amazonas, Brazil
7 Sep 199759.6DiedBishop of Parintins, Amazonas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Gino Malvestio
Bishop Gino Malvestio P.I.M.E. (born , died ) Bishop of Parintins

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMoale, Italy

  • a priest for 32.1 years
  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138, Number 12,318
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast