Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Cunial

Deceased

Bishop of Vittorio Veneto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1915BornPossagno
9 Jul 193923.8Ordained PriestPriest of Treviso, Italy
21 Mar 196347.5AppointedBishop of Lucera, Italy
11 May 196347.7Ordained BishopBishop of Lucera, Italy
9 Mar 197054.5AppointedBishop of Vittorio Veneto, Italy
10 Aug 198266.9DiedBishop of Vittorio Veneto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Cunial:
Bishop Antonio Cunial (born , died ) Bishop of Vittorio Veneto

  • a priest for 43.1 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013