Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Carlo Agostini

Deceased

Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1888BornSan Martino di Lupari
24 Sep 191022.4Ordained PriestPriest of Treviso, Italy
30 Jan 193243.8AppointedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
10 Apr 193244.0Ordained BishopBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
8 May 193244.0InstalledBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
5 Feb 194960.8AppointedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
28 Dec 195264.7DiedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
12 Jan 195364.7Elevated to CardinalDied Before Publication

MicroData Summary for Carlo Agostini:
Patriarch Carlo Agostini (born , died ) Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}

  • a priest for 42.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1932, Number 16
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013