Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Maria Pellizzari

Deceased

Bishop of Piacenza, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1851Born
1873¹21.8Ordained PriestPriest of Treviso, Italy
15 Sep 190554.5AppointedBishop of Piacenza, Italy
1 Oct 190554.5Ordained BishopBishop of Piacenza, Italy
18 Sep 192069.5DiedBishop of Piacenza, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Maria Pellizzari (VIAF: 89651504)
Bishop Giovanni Maria Pellizzari (born , died ) Bishop of Piacenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Zenone degli Ezzelini

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1905, Number 43
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 303

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast