Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arnoldo Onisto

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vicenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1912BornAsolo
18 Nov 193422.3Ordained PriestPriest of Treviso, Italy
11 Sep 197159.2AppointedBishop of Vicenza, Italy
17 Oct 197159.3Ordained BishopBishop of Vicenza, Italy
20 Feb 198875.6RetiredBishop of Vicenza, Italy
8 May 199279.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Vicenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Arnoldo Onisto:
Bishop Arnoldo Onisto (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vicenza

  • a priest for 57.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 7 Oct 2014