Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giorgio Cornaro

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Treviso, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1524Born
20 Feb 153813.9AppointedBishop of Treviso, Italy
1552¹27.8Ordained BishopBishop of Treviso, Italy
13 Jan 156136.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
8 Feb 156540.9ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
29 Nov 157753.7ResignedBishop of Treviso, Italy
1578²53.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Treviso, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giorgio Cornaro
Bishop Giorgio Cornaro (born , died 1578) Bishop Emeritus of Treviso

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Death PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}

  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 309
  • b/c2: AT, 21 Jul 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 18,957
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 262
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1552, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast