Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Mistrorigo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Treviso, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1912Born
7 Jul 193523.2Ordained PriestPriest of Vicenza, Italy
9 Mar 195542.9AppointedBishop of Troia, Italy
25 Apr 195543.0Ordained BishopBishop of Troia, Italy
25 Jun 195846.2AppointedBishop of Treviso, Italy
19 Nov 198876.6RetiredBishop of Treviso, Italy
14 Jan 201299.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Treviso, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Mistrorigo
Bishop Antonio Mistrorigo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Treviso

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChiampo

  • a priest for 76.5 years
  • a bishop for 56.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 26
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Aug 2017