Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Mantiero

Deceased

Bishop of Treviso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1884BornNovoledo di Villaverla
25 Jul 190924.8Ordained PriestPriest of Vicenza, Italy
26 Sep 193147.0AppointedBishop of Patti, Italy
15 Nov 193147.1Ordained BishopBishop of Patti, Italy
27 Dec 193147.3InstalledBishop of Patti, Italy
11 Jun 193550.7AppointedPrelate of Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy
24 Aug 193651.9AppointedBishop of Treviso, Italy
6 Dec 193652.2InstalledBishop of Treviso, Italy
15 Feb 195671.4DiedBishop of Treviso, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Mantiero:
Bishop Antonio Mantiero (born , died ) Bishop of Treviso

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1931, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 2 Jan 2015