Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardino Marini, C.R.L. †

Deceased

Bishop of Treviso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1739BornLuogo di Clissa
21 Aug 176829.4Ordained PriestPriest of Canons Regular of the Congregation of the Most Holy Saviour of the Lateran
7 Apr 178849.0AppointedBishop of Treviso, Italy
13 Apr 178849.0Ordained BishopBishop of Treviso, Italy
9 Oct 181778.5DiedBishop of Treviso, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bernardino Marini:
Bishop Bernardino Marini C.R.L. (born , died ) Bishop of Treviso

  • a priest for 49.1 years
  • a bishop for 29.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,478

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013