Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Cornaro (Jr.)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Treviso

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1547BornVenice
29 Nov 157730.9AppointedBishop of Treviso, Italy
1595²48.0ResignedBishop of Treviso, Italy
5 Jun 159649.4Elevated to Cardinal
21 Jun 159649.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
23 Apr 159851.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Treviso, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Cornaro (Jr.):
Cardinal Francesco Cornaro (Jr.) (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Treviso

  • a cardinal for 1.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Jun 1596
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 309

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013