Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Marco Cardinal Barbo

Deceased

Patriarch of Aquileia

Cardinal-Priest of San Marco

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1420²BornVenice
14 Nov 145535.8AppointedBishop of Treviso, Italy
17 Sep 146444.7AppointedBishop of Vicenza, Italy
1 Oct 146444.7InstalledBishop of Vicenza, Italy
18 Sep 146747.7Elevated to Cardinal
2 Oct 146747.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
18 Mar 147050.2AppointedPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy
6 Nov 147858.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
2 Mar 149171.1DiedPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marco Barbo:
Marco Cardinal Barbo (died ) Patriarch of Aquileia

  • a cardinal for 23.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Sep 1467
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 248

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015