Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Augusto Antonio Zacco

Deceased

Bishop of Treviso, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1662Born
1 Jun 168724.5Ordained PriestPriest
15 Nov 170644.0AppointedArchbishop of Corfù, Greece
21 Nov 170644.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Corfù, Greece
22 Nov 172361.0AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Treviso, Italy
18 Feb 173976.2DiedBishop of Treviso, Italy

MicroData Summary for Augusto Antonio Zacco (VIAF: 29163910)
Archbishop Augusto Antonio Zacco (born , died ) Bishop of Treviso

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia

  • a priest for 51.7 years
  • a bishop for 32.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 172, and Page 370
  • ob/c2: CB, 21 Nov 2014
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Number 18,292
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1706, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast