Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Giovanni Brugnaro

Archbishop Emeritus of Camerino-San Severino Marche, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1943 Born
18 Dec 198239.7Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
3 Sep 200764.4AppointedArchbishop of Camerino-San Severino Marche, Italy
29 Sep 200764.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Camerino-San Severino Marche, Italy
28 Oct 200764.6InstalledArchbishop of Camerino-San Severino Marche, Italy
27 Jul 201875.3RetiredArchbishop of Camerino-San Severino Marche, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Giovanni Brugnaro
Archbishop Francesco Giovanni Brugnaro (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Camerino-San Severino Marche

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Donà di Piave, Diocese of Treviso
Ordained PriestTempio della Pace, Padova, Diocese of Padova {Padua}
Ordained BishopSt. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Camerino-San Severino Marche.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Sep 2007
  • ob/c2+/i: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,524
  • loc: AM, 12 Mar 2018
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Jul 2018

Quantcast