Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Morosini

Deceased

Bishop of Brescia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1605¹BornVenezia
3 Oct 163934.8AppointedBishop of Treviso, Italy
9 Oct 163934.8Ordained BishopBishop of Treviso, Italy
31 Jul 164540.6AppointedBishop of Brescia, Italy
4 Oct 165449.8DiedBishop of Brescia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marco Morosini:
Bishop Marco Morosini (died ) Bishop of Brescia

  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 329, and Page 121
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 104, Number 629

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013